Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
George #H56048, Richard, filed a(n) Civil case against Cagnina, C., Justin, N., Mccomas, M, Neuschmid, R., Voong, M., (total of 5) See All represented by Goodwin, David C., in the jurisdiction of Solano County. This case was filed in Solano County Superior Courts with Christine A. Carringer presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeChristine A. Carringer Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 08, 2019 |
CategoryCivil |
Last RefreshedMay 13, 2022 |
|
Filing LocationSolano County, CA |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 28, 2021 | Docket Event | COURT REPORTER TRANSCRIPT-ONLI | |
May 26, 2021 | Docket Event | RECEIVED | |
May 13, 2021 | Docket Event | NOTICE (NO FEE) | |
January 14, 2021 | Docket Event | MINUTE ORDER | |
January 07, 2021 | Docket Event | HEARD | |
January 07, 2021 | Tentative Ruling |
GEORGE’s Motion to Use a Settled Statement on Appeal TENTATIVE RULING Parties to appear. Appellant’s motion is denied as moot. Respondents have provided a reporter’s transcript of oral proceedings and...
Judge: CHRISTINE CARRINGER |
|
December 29, 2020 | Docket Event |
OPPOSITION (NO FEE) VOONG, M. |
|
December 29, 2020 | Docket Event |
NOTICE (NO FEE) VOONG, M. |
|
December 23, 2020 | Docket Event | COURT REPORTER TRANSCRIPT-ONLI | |
November 17, 2020 | Docket Event |
PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL GEORGE #H56048, RICHARD |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.