Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Bodiford, Matthew, Sedgwick Claims Management Services, Inc. For Republic Under, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case against Lewis, Betty, Lewis, Melinda, represented by Hermanson, Kevin J., Santana, Helen, in the jurisdiction of Solano County. This case was filed in Solano County Superior Courts with Earl Bradley Nelson presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateSeptember 26, 2017 |
CategoryCivil |
Last RefreshedMay 16, 2022 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationSolano County, CA |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 20, 2021 | Docket Event | VACATED | |
July 20, 2021 | Docket Event |
DISMISSAL ENTIRE ACTION W/PRE BODIFORD, MATTHEW |
|
June 02, 2021 | Docket Event | MINUTE ORDER | |
May 27, 2021 | Docket Event | MINUTE ORDER | |
May 27, 2021 | Docket Event | HEARD | |
May 26, 2021 | Docket Event | HEARD | |
May 25, 2021 | Docket Event | MINUTE ORDER | |
May 24, 2021 | Docket Event | TRIAL SET | |
May 24, 2021 | Docket Event | VACATED | |
May 24, 2021 | Docket Event | HEARD |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.