Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Elmi, Gita S, Elmi, Khashayar, filed a(n) General Property - Property case against Caliber Home Loans, Inc. A Business Entity, Clear Recon Corp, A Business Entity, represented by Anderson, Genail M., in the jurisdiction of Solano County. This case was filed in Solano County Superior Courts with Scott L. Kays presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMarch 01, 2017 |
CategoryDo - Complaint For Real Property |
Last RefreshedJanuary 12, 2022 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationSolano County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Property |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 08, 2017 | Docket Event |
DISMISSED ELMI, KHASHAYAR |
|
June 02, 2017 | Docket Event | VACATED | |
June 02, 2017 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF CONDITIONAL SETTLMNT ELMI, KHASHAYAR |
|
April 05, 2017 | Docket Event |
DECL OF NON-MONETARY STATUS CLEAR RECON CORP, A BUSINESS ENTITY, |
|
April 03, 2017 | Docket Event |
UNLIMITED RESPONSE CALIBER HOME LOANS, INC. A BUSINESS ENTITY, |
|
April 03, 2017 | Docket Event |
REQ STIP & ORDER NO HEARING CALIBER HOME LOANS, INC. A BUSINESS ENTITY, |
|
April 03, 2017 | Docket Event |
PAYMENT CALIBER HOME LOANS, INC. A BUSINESS ENTITY, |
|
March 01, 2017 | Docket Event |
SUMMONS ISSUED ELMI, KHASHAYAR |
|
March 01, 2017 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONF | |
March 01, 2017 | Docket Event |
UNLIMITED COMPLAINT ELMI, KHASHAYAR |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.