Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Fireman'S Fund Insurance Company, filed a(n) Personal Injury - Torts case against Statcomm, Inc., in the jurisdiction of Solano County. This case was filed in Solano County Superior Courts with Scott L. Kays presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 04, 2017 |
CategoryPi - Complaint For Personal Injury |
Last RefreshedJanuary 12, 2022 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationSolano County, CA |
Matter TypePersonal Injury |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 21, 2017 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF ENTRY OF DISMISSAL FIREMAN'S FUND INSURANCE COMPANY, |
|
April 05, 2017 | Docket Event |
DISMISSED FIREMAN'S FUND INSURANCE COMPANY, |
|
March 14, 2017 | Docket Event | VACATED | |
March 14, 2017 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF CONDITIONAL SETTLMNT FIREMAN'S FUND INSURANCE COMPANY, |
|
February 02, 2017 | Docket Event |
PROOF OF SERVICE FIREMAN'S FUND INSURANCE COMPANY, |
|
February 02, 2017 | Docket Event |
PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL FIREMAN'S FUND INSURANCE COMPANY, |
|
January 04, 2017 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONF | |
January 04, 2017 | Docket Event |
UNLIMITED COMPLAINT FIREMAN'S FUND INSURANCE COMPANY, |
|
January 04, 2017 | Docket Event |
SUMMONS ISSUED FIREMAN'S FUND INSURANCE COMPANY, |
|
January 04, 2017 | Docket Event |
CASE COVER SHEET FIREMAN'S FUND INSURANCE COMPANY, |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.