Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Americredit Financial Services, Inc. Dba Gm Financial, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Nagel, Austin P, against Ochoa, Jonathan, Ochoa, Sheree, in the jurisdiction of Solano County. This case was filed in Solano County Superior Courts with Scott L. Kays presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 06, 2016 |
CategoryCb - Breach Of Contract |
Last RefreshedJanuary 12, 2022 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationSolano County, CA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 13, 2017 | Docket Event |
DISMISSAL ENTIRE ACTION WO PRE AMERICREDIT FINANCIAL SERVICES, INC. DBA GM FINANCIAL, |
|
April 13, 2017 | Docket Event | VACATED | |
April 05, 2017 | Docket Event |
PROOF OF SERVICE AMERICREDIT FINANCIAL SERVICES, INC. DBA GM FINANCIAL, |
|
March 13, 2017 | Docket Event |
CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT ONE AMERICREDIT FINANCIAL SERVICES, INC. DBA GM FINANCIAL, |
|
February 02, 2017 | Docket Event |
NOTICE (NO FEE) KAYS, SCOTT L. |
|
January 31, 2017 | Docket Event | VACATED | |
December 06, 2016 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONF | |
December 06, 2016 | Docket Event |
UNLIMITED COMPLAINT AMERICREDIT FINANCIAL SERVICES, INC. DBA GM FINANCIAL, |
|
December 06, 2016 | Docket Event |
SUMMONS ISSUED AMERICREDIT FINANCIAL SERVICES, INC. DBA GM FINANCIAL, |
|
December 06, 2016 | Docket Event |
DECLARATION AMERICREDIT FINANCIAL SERVICES, INC. DBA GM FINANCIAL, |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.