Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Augerlavoie Sr., Jon Pierre, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case against Berncich, Torey Dalton, in the jurisdiction of Solano County. This case was filed in Solano County Superior Courts with Harry S. Kinnicutt presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 31, 2015 |
CategoryMv - Compl.For Motor Vehicle |
Last RefreshedJanuary 12, 2022 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationSolano County, CA |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 02, 2017 | Docket Event | VACATED | |
December 09, 2016 | Docket Event | VACATED | |
August 01, 2016 | Docket Event | HEARD | |
July 26, 2016 | Docket Event | VACATED | |
July 26, 2016 | Docket Event | HEARD | |
July 07, 2016 | Docket Event | CONSOLIDATED | |
June 29, 2016 | Docket Event | HEARD | |
June 29, 2016 | Docket Event | VACATED | |
April 29, 2016 | Docket Event | VACATED | |
April 26, 2016 | Docket Event | MINUTE ORDER |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.