Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Laffitte, Miriam, Lotersztain, Mariana, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case against Duran, Jose Fabian, Duran, Michelle, represented by Hepler, Jenica L., in the jurisdiction of Solano County. This case was filed in Solano County Superior Courts with Michael Mattice presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 31, 2015 |
CategoryMv - Compl.For Motor Vehicle |
Last RefreshedJanuary 12, 2022 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationSolano County, CA |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 20, 2016 | Docket Event | VACATED | |
September 20, 2016 | Docket Event |
DISMISSAL ENTIRE ACTION W/PRE LOTERSZTAIN, MARIANA |
|
May 17, 2016 | Docket Event |
NOTICE (NO FEE) DURAN, MICHELLE |
|
May 05, 2016 | Docket Event |
NOTICE (NO FEE) LOTERSZTAIN, MARIANA |
|
April 21, 2016 | Docket Event | MINUTE ORDER | |
April 21, 2016 | Docket Event | HEARD | |
April 21, 2016 | Docket Event | MEDIATION | |
March 23, 2016 | Docket Event |
CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT ONE LOTERSZTAIN, MARIANA |
|
March 23, 2016 | Docket Event |
NOTICE (NO FEE) LOTERSZTAIN, MARIANA |
|
March 02, 2016 | Docket Event |
UNLIMITED RESPONSE DURAN, MICHELLE |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.