Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Lee, Rolida, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case against Ballesteros Parker, Sidney Lovell, represented by Snook, Terrence Tilliman, in the jurisdiction of Solano County. This case was filed in Solano County Superior Courts with Harry S. Kinnicutt presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 07, 2015 |
CategoryMv - Compl.For Motor Vehicle |
Last RefreshedJanuary 12, 2022 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationSolano County, CA |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 25, 2016 | Docket Event | VACATED | |
October 25, 2016 | Docket Event |
DISMISSAL ENTIRE ACTION W/PRE BALLESTEROS PARKER, SIDNEY LOVELL |
|
August 22, 2016 | Docket Event | VACATED | |
August 19, 2016 | Docket Event |
NOTC OF UNCONDITIONAL SETTLMNT LEE, ROLIDA |
|
August 04, 2016 | Docket Event |
CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT ONE BALLESTEROS PARKER, SIDNEY LOVELL |
|
August 02, 2016 | Docket Event |
JURY DEPOSIT BALLESTEROS PARKER, SIDNEY LOVELL |
|
August 02, 2016 | Docket Event |
PAYMENT BALLESTEROS PARKER, SIDNEY LOVELL |
|
August 02, 2016 | Docket Event |
UNLIMITED RESPONSE BALLESTEROS PARKER, SIDNEY LOVELL |
|
August 02, 2016 | Docket Event |
GENERAL DENIAL (NO FEE) BALLESTEROS PARKER, SIDNEY LOVELL |
|
June 15, 2016 | Docket Event | MINUTE ORDER |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.