Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Hendrix, Kevyn, filed a(n) Personal Injury - Torts case against Andrews, Elena, Andrews, William, in the jurisdiction of Solano County. This case was filed in Solano County Superior Courts with POWER, DAVID EDWIN presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 29, 2014 |
CategoryPi - Complaint For Personal Injury |
Last RefreshedJanuary 12, 2022 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationSolano County, CA |
Matter TypePersonal Injury |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 07, 2016 | Docket Event | OFF CALENDAR | |
June 07, 2016 | Docket Event | VACATED | |
June 07, 2016 | Docket Event | HEARD | |
June 07, 2016 | Docket Event |
DISMISSAL ENTIRE ACTION W/PRE HENDRIX, KEVYN |
|
April 06, 2016 | Docket Event | NOTICE (NO FEE) | |
April 04, 2016 | Docket Event | NOTICE (NO FEE) | |
January 21, 2016 | Docket Event | HEARD | |
January 21, 2016 | Docket Event | MINUTE ORDER | |
January 20, 2016 | Docket Event |
CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT ONE HENDRIX, KEVYN |
|
December 08, 2015 | Docket Event |
PROOF OF SERVICE HENDRIX, KEVYN |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.