Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Fairfield Quail Terrace, Llc., filed a(n) Ap - Appeal case against Kidka, Kidlen D., in the jurisdiction of Solano County. This case was filed in Solano County Superior Courts with Harry S. Kinnicutt presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 22, 2014 |
CategoryAp - Appeal |
Last RefreshedJanuary 12, 2022 |
|
Filing LocationSolano County, CA |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 28, 2015 | Docket Event | RETURNED | |
May 08, 2015 | Docket Event | RECEIVED | |
May 08, 2015 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATE&AFFDVT OF MAILING | |
March 06, 2015 | Docket Event | RETURNED | |
March 05, 2015 | Docket Event | RETURNED | |
February 11, 2015 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATE&AFFDVT OF MAILING | |
February 11, 2015 | Docket Event | ORDER OF DISMISSAL | |
February 05, 2015 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATE&AFFDVT OF MAILING | |
February 05, 2015 | Docket Event | DECLARATION | |
January 20, 2015 | Docket Event | NOTICE (NO FEE) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.