Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
J.G. Wentworth Originations, Llc, Pace, A, filed a(n) Mp - Miscellaneous Civil Petition case in the jurisdiction of Solano County. This case was filed in Solano County Superior Courts with Scott L. Kays presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 19, 2014 |
CategoryMp - Miscellaneous Civil Petition |
Last RefreshedJanuary 12, 2022 |
|
Filing LocationSolano County, CA |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 22, 2015 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT J.G. WENTWORTH ORIGINATIONS, LLC, |
|
April 10, 2015 | Docket Event |
DISMISSAL ENTIRE ACTION WO PRE J.G. WENTWORTH ORIGINATIONS, LLC, |
|
April 08, 2015 | Docket Event | VACATED | |
April 01, 2015 | Docket Event |
NOTICE (NO FEE) J.G. WENTWORTH ORIGINATIONS, LLC, |
|
March 23, 2015 | Docket Event | CONTINUED | |
March 17, 2015 | Docket Event | MINUTE ORDER | |
March 10, 2015 | Docket Event | HEARD | |
December 30, 2014 | Docket Event |
MOTION FEE J.G. WENTWORTH ORIGINATIONS, LLC, |
|
December 30, 2014 | Docket Event |
PAYMENT J.G. WENTWORTH ORIGINATIONS, LLC, |
|
December 30, 2014 | Docket Event |
COURT RPTR FEE UNDER ONE HOUR J.G. WENTWORTH ORIGINATIONS, LLC, |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.