Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Brian Smith, Sucessor Trustee Under The Donald & Sylvia Benn, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case against King, Eugene D., Pruitt, Lola, Thomas King, Mary L., in the jurisdiction of Solano County. This case was filed in Solano County Superior Courts with Scott L. Kays presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 19, 2014 |
CategoryCb - Breach Of Contract |
Last RefreshedFebruary 14, 2022 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationSolano County, CA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 28, 2017 | Docket Event |
WRIT FILED BRIAN SMITH, SUCESSOR TRUSTEE UNDER THE DONALD & SYLVIA BENN, |
|
October 05, 2016 | Docket Event | RETURNED | |
August 31, 2016 | Docket Event |
PAYMENT BRIAN SMITH, SUCESSOR TRUSTEE UNDER THE DONALD & SYLVIA BENN, |
|
August 31, 2016 | Docket Event |
WRIT ISSUED BRIAN SMITH, SUCESSOR TRUSTEE UNDER THE DONALD & SYLVIA BENN, |
|
May 13, 2016 | Docket Event | EXHIBITS/ORDERS FOR RELEASE/DE | |
May 12, 2016 | Docket Event | SUBMITTED | |
December 07, 2015 | Docket Event |
CERTIFIED COPY BRIAN SMITH, SUCESSOR TRUSTEE UNDER THE DONALD & SYLVIA BENN, |
|
December 07, 2015 | Docket Event |
ABSTRACT ISSUED BRIAN SMITH, SUCESSOR TRUSTEE UNDER THE DONALD & SYLVIA BENN, |
|
December 07, 2015 | Docket Event |
PAYMENT BRIAN SMITH, SUCESSOR TRUSTEE UNDER THE DONALD & SYLVIA BENN, |
|
November 12, 2015 | Docket Event | MINUTE ORDER |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.