Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Chestang #J10643, Mr. Daniel K, filed a(n) Cc - Civil Complaint case against Blackwell, L.T., Mahoney, A., Major, L.T., Mitchell, R., in the jurisdiction of Solano County. This case was filed in Solano County Superior Courts with Harry S. Kinnicutt presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 19, 2014 |
CategoryCc - Civil Complaint |
Last RefreshedJanuary 12, 2022 |
|
Filing LocationSolano County, CA |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 15, 2016 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT BLACKWELL, L.T. |
|
March 25, 2016 | Docket Event |
JUDGMENT ENTERED BY COURT BLACKWELL, L.T. |
|
March 25, 2016 | Docket Event |
ORDER BLACKWELL, L.T. |
|
March 24, 2016 | Docket Event | MINUTE ORDER | |
March 24, 2016 | Docket Event | GRANTED | |
March 24, 2016 | Docket Event | HEARD | |
February 24, 2016 | Docket Event |
MEMORANDUM BLACKWELL, L.T. |
|
February 24, 2016 | Docket Event |
MOTION FEE BLACKWELL, L.T. |
|
August 26, 2015 | Docket Event |
ORDER BLACKWELL, L.T. |
|
July 21, 2015 | Docket Event | HEARD |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.