Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Bynum, Akeem, Goode, Thomas, Morlet, Edoardo, Carrier, Marquita, Guditus, Jessica A, (total of 5) See All filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case against Carrier, Marquita, Guditus, Jessica A, represented by Gordon, Ian, Walsh, Catherine, in the jurisdiction of Solano County. This case was filed in Solano County Superior Courts with Harry S. Kinnicutt presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 17, 2014 |
CategoryMv - Compl.For Motor Vehicle |
Last RefreshedJanuary 12, 2022 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationSolano County, CA |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 24, 2017 | Docket Event | MINUTE ORDER | |
January 24, 2017 | Docket Event | HEARD | |
January 24, 2017 | Docket Event | CASE DISMISSED | |
October 27, 2016 | Docket Event | MINUTE ORDER | |
October 27, 2016 | Docket Event | CONT COURT'S MOTION | |
September 12, 2016 | Docket Event |
CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT TWO CARRIER, MARQUITA |
|
August 08, 2016 | Docket Event | VACATED | |
August 04, 2016 | Docket Event | VACATED | |
August 04, 2016 | Docket Event |
NOTICE (NO FEE) GUDITUS, JESSICA A |
|
August 03, 2016 | Docket Event |
NOTICE (NO FEE) GOODE, THOMAS |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.