Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Gomez, Irma, Gomez, Juan Manuel, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by In Pro Per, against Ponce, Antonio, Ponce, Eliza, in the jurisdiction of Solano County. This case was filed in Solano County Superior Courts with Harry S. Kinnicutt presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 15, 2014 |
CategoryCb - Breach Of Contract |
Last RefreshedJanuary 12, 2022 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationSolano County, CA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 17, 2016 | Docket Event | VACATED | |
June 17, 2016 | Docket Event |
DISMISSAL ENTIRE ACTION W/PRE GOMEZ, JUAN MANUEL |
|
May 10, 2016 | Docket Event | MINUTE ORDER | |
February 10, 2016 | Docket Event | HEARD | |
February 10, 2016 | Docket Event | MINUTE ORDER | |
December 09, 2015 | Docket Event | HEARD | |
December 09, 2015 | Docket Event |
PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL GOMEZ, JUAN MANUEL |
|
December 09, 2015 | Docket Event | CONTINUED | |
December 09, 2015 | Docket Event | MINUTE ORDER | |
September 30, 2015 | Docket Event | MINUTE ORDER |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.