Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Herbert, J.D., Stratcap Investments, Inc., filed a(n) Mp - Miscellaneous Civil Petition case represented by Ahtirski, Eugene A, in the jurisdiction of Solano County. This case was filed in Solano County Superior Courts with POWER, DAVID EDWIN presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 08, 2014 |
CategoryMp - Miscellaneous Civil Petition |
Last RefreshedJanuary 12, 2022 |
|
Filing LocationSolano County, CA |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 18, 2015 | Docket Event | VACATED | |
March 18, 2015 | Docket Event |
DISMISSAL ENTIRE ACTION WO PRE STRATCAP INVESTMENTS, INC., |
|
March 06, 2015 | Docket Event |
NOTICE (NO FEE) STRATCAP INVESTMENTS, INC., |
|
February 27, 2015 | Docket Event | CONT PARTY'S MOTION | |
February 27, 2015 | Docket Event | MINUTE ORDER | |
February 24, 2015 | Docket Event |
NOTICE (NO FEE) STRATCAP INVESTMENTS, INC., |
|
February 18, 2015 | Docket Event | MINUTE ORDER | |
February 18, 2015 | Docket Event | CONT COURT'S MOTION | |
February 17, 2015 | Docket Event |
NOTICE (NO FEE) STRATCAP INVESTMENTS, INC., |
|
February 17, 2015 | Docket Event |
AFFIDAVIT STRATCAP INVESTMENTS, INC., |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.