Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Cesmas, Ruth, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Parker, Priscilla M, against Gonzalez, Patricia, in the jurisdiction of Solano County. This case was filed in Solano County Superior Courts with POWER, DAVID EDWIN presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 05, 2014 |
CategoryMv - Compl.For Motor Vehicle |
Last RefreshedJanuary 12, 2022 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationSolano County, CA |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 02, 2015 | Docket Event | VACATED | |
May 08, 2015 | Docket Event |
DISMISSED CESMAS, RUTH |
|
April 06, 2015 | Docket Event | VACATED | |
April 06, 2015 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF CONDITIONAL SETTLMNT CESMAS, RUTH |
|
January 26, 2015 | Docket Event | VACATED | |
January 26, 2015 | Docket Event |
NOTICE (NO FEE) POWER, DAVID EDWIN |
|
January 13, 2015 | Docket Event |
PROOF OF SERVICE CESMAS, RUTH |
|
January 13, 2015 | Docket Event |
DECLARATION OF DUE DILIGENCE CESMAS, RUTH |
|
December 19, 2014 | Docket Event |
NOTICE (NO FEE) POWER, DAVID EDWIN |
|
December 19, 2014 | Docket Event | VACATED |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.