Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Allstate Ins. Co. As Surogee For Higgins And Brisbon, Karn, Robert, filed a(n) Cc - Civil Complaint case against Karn, Robert, Wuelzer, Jeremy, in the jurisdiction of Solano County. This case was filed in Solano County Superior Courts with Paul Lloyd Beeman presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 05, 2014 |
CategoryCc - Civil Complaint |
Last RefreshedJanuary 12, 2022 |
|
Filing LocationSolano County, CA |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 19, 2016 | Docket Event |
DISMISSED KARN, ROBERT |
|
April 19, 2016 | Docket Event |
DISMISSAL ENTIRE ACTION W/PRE ALLSTATE INS. CO. AS SUROGEE FOR HIGGINS AND BRISBON, |
|
March 02, 2016 | Docket Event | VACATED | |
March 01, 2016 | Docket Event |
NOTC OF UNCONDITIONAL SETTLMNT ALLSTATE INS. CO. AS SUROGEE FOR HIGGINS AND BRISBON, |
|
February 19, 2016 | Docket Event |
CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT TWO ALLSTATE INS. CO. AS SUROGEE FOR HIGGINS AND BRISBON, |
|
February 19, 2016 | Docket Event | RETURNED | |
February 17, 2016 | Docket Event |
CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT TWO WUELZER, JEREMY |
|
January 12, 2016 | Docket Event | ORDER | |
November 04, 2015 | Docket Event | MINUTE ORDER | |
November 02, 2015 | Docket Event | UNDER SUBMISSION |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.