Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Urena, Dominique, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Gonzalez, Omar, against Mackey, Linda, Smith, Jessica Renae, represented by De Lira, Matthew, in the jurisdiction of Solano County. This case was filed in Solano County Superior Courts with Harry S. Kinnicutt presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 04, 2014 |
CategoryMv - Compl.For Motor Vehicle |
Last RefreshedFebruary 14, 2022 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationSolano County, CA |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 19, 2016 | Docket Event |
DISMISSAL ENTIRE ACTION WO PRE URENA, DOMINIQUE |
|
February 19, 2016 | Docket Event | VACATED | |
December 01, 2015 | Docket Event |
NOTICE (NO FEE) MACKEY, LINDA |
|
November 25, 2015 | Docket Event | MINUTE ORDER | |
November 24, 2015 | Docket Event | MINUTE ORDER | |
November 24, 2015 | Docket Event | HEARD | |
November 10, 2015 | Docket Event |
CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT TWO SMITH, JESSICA RENAE |
|
October 30, 2015 | Docket Event |
CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT TWO URENA, DOMINIQUE |
|
July 15, 2015 | Docket Event | MINUTE ORDER | |
July 14, 2015 | Docket Event | HEARD |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.