Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Alicia Soriano, As Executor For The Estate Of Gaudencia Sori, filed a(n) General Property - Property case against Galos, Leticia, Maanao, Berlina, Ocwen Federal Bank Fsb, represented by Ellis-Andrews, Danielle M., Horner, Clifford Rex, in the jurisdiction of Solano County. This case was filed in Solano County Superior Courts with Paul Lloyd Beeman presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 03, 2014 |
CategoryDo - Complaint For Real Property |
Last RefreshedJanuary 12, 2022 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationSolano County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Property |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 28, 2016 | Docket Event |
DISMISSED GALOS, LETICIA |
|
July 29, 2016 | Docket Event | NOTICE (NO FEE) | |
April 01, 2016 | Docket Event | VACATED | |
April 01, 2016 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF CONDITIONAL SETTLMNT GALOS, LETICIA |
|
November 16, 2015 | Docket Event | MINUTE ORDER | |
November 16, 2015 | Docket Event | TRIAL SET | |
November 16, 2015 | Docket Event | HEARD | |
November 06, 2015 | Docket Event |
REQ STIP & ORDER NO HEARING GALOS, LETICIA |
|
November 06, 2015 | Docket Event |
PAYMENT GALOS, LETICIA |
|
November 05, 2015 | Docket Event | RETURNED |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.