Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Holtz, Peggy Welsh, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case against Campbell, Bettina Kathleen, in the jurisdiction of Solano County. This case was filed in Solano County Superior Courts with Scott L. Kays presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 02, 2014 |
CategoryMv - Compl.For Motor Vehicle |
Last RefreshedJanuary 12, 2022 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationSolano County, CA |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 22, 2015 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF ENTRY OF DISMISSAL CAMPBELL, BETTINA KATHLEEN |
|
June 18, 2015 | Docket Event | VACATED | |
June 18, 2015 | Docket Event |
DISMISSAL ENTIRE ACTION W/PRE CAMPBELL, BETTINA KATHLEEN |
|
June 15, 2015 | Docket Event |
NOTC OF UNCONDITIONAL SETTLMNT HOLTZ, PEGGY WELSH |
|
April 03, 2015 | Docket Event | HEARD | |
March 23, 2015 | Docket Event |
PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL HOLTZ, PEGGY WELSH |
|
March 23, 2015 | Docket Event |
CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT ONE HOLTZ, PEGGY WELSH |
|
March 17, 2015 | Docket Event |
CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT ONE CAMPBELL, BETTINA KATHLEEN |
|
February 18, 2015 | Docket Event |
UNLIMITED RESPONSE CAMPBELL, BETTINA KATHLEEN |
|
February 18, 2015 | Docket Event |
JURY DEPOSIT CAMPBELL, BETTINA KATHLEEN |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.