Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Bailey, Ginetta, filed a(n) Personal Injury - Torts case against Taylor, Ronald, Taylor, Steven, Walter William Taylor, Trustee Or His Successors In Trust, U, in the jurisdiction of Solano County. This case was filed in Solano County Superior Courts with Paul Lloyd Beeman presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 01, 2014 |
CategoryPi - Complaint For Personal Injury |
Last RefreshedJanuary 12, 2022 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationSolano County, CA |
Matter TypePersonal Injury |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 27, 2015 | Docket Event |
DISMISSAL ENTIRE ACTION WO PRE BAILEY, GINETTA |
|
March 27, 2015 | Docket Event | VACATED | |
March 24, 2015 | Docket Event | HEARD | |
March 24, 2015 | Docket Event | MINUTE ORDER | |
March 03, 2015 | Docket Event |
CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT ONE BAILEY, GINETTA |
|
December 09, 2014 | Docket Event |
PROOF OF SERVICE BAILEY, GINETTA |
|
December 05, 2014 | Docket Event |
SUMMONS ISSUED BAILEY, GINETTA |
|
December 01, 2014 | Docket Event |
PAYMENT BAILEY, GINETTA |
|
December 01, 2014 | Docket Event | NO SUMMONS ISSUED | |
December 01, 2014 | Docket Event |
UNLIMITED COMPLAINT BAILEY, GINETTA |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.