Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Ward, Paul, filed a(n) General Property - Property case represented by Reep, Scott D, against Hoover, Delvita Natalie, Cirimele And Associates Inc, Coakley, As Trustee Of The Marie C Eggert Testamentary Trust, Michael J, Coakley, Michael J., in the jurisdiction of Solano County. This case was filed in Solano County Superior Courts with POWER, DAVID EDWIN presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 28, 2010 |
CategoryDo - Complaint For Real Property |
Last RefreshedJanuary 12, 2022 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationSolano County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Property |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 26, 2011 | Docket Event |
DISMISSAL ENTIRE ACTION WO PRE WARD, PAUL |
|
September 26, 2011 | Docket Event | DISMISSAL ENTIRE ACTION WO PRE | |
July 20, 2011 | Docket Event | HEARD | |
July 20, 2011 | Docket Event | MINUTE ORDER | |
July 15, 2011 | Docket Event |
CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT ONE WARD, PAUL |
|
July 12, 2011 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF REASSIGNMENT | |
May 09, 2011 | Docket Event | NOTICE (NO FEE) | |
April 27, 2011 | Docket Event | HEARD | |
April 27, 2011 | Docket Event | MINUTE ORDER | |
April 27, 2011 | Docket Event | JUDGE SELF-DISQUALIFICATION |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.