Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Brock, David Kenneth, filed a(n) General Employment - Labor and Employment case represented by Minnis, Aaron P., against Gaw Van Male Smith Myers & Reynolds, Apc, in the jurisdiction of Solano County. This case was filed in Solano County Superior Courts with Harry S. Kinnicutt presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 23, 2010 |
CategoryE - Employment |
Last RefreshedJanuary 12, 2022 |
Practice AreaLabor and Employment |
Filing LocationSolano County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Employment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 10, 2012 | Docket Event |
DISMISSAL ENTIRE ACTION W/PRE BROCK, DAVID KENNETH |
|
December 10, 2012 | Docket Event | DISMISSAL ENTIRE ACTION W/PRE | |
December 04, 2012 | Docket Event | NOTICE (NO FEE) | |
October 20, 2011 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF CONDITIONAL SETTLMNT BROCK, DAVID KENNETH |
|
October 20, 2011 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF CONDITIONAL SETTLMNT | |
August 17, 2011 | Docket Event | MINUTE ORDER | |
August 17, 2011 | Docket Event | HEARD | |
August 17, 2011 | Docket Event | CONTINUED | |
August 02, 2011 | Docket Event |
CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT TWO BROCK, DAVID KENNETH |
|
August 02, 2011 | Docket Event |
CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT TWO GAW VAN MALE SMITH MYERS & REYNOLDS, APC, |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.