Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Nguyen, Xuan Mai, filed a(n) Personal Injury - Torts case against La Charrita Mexican Market, Magallans, Maria, Rodriguez, Jose, represented by Silver, Paul, in the jurisdiction of Solano County. This case was filed in Solano County Superior Courts with Robert S. Bowers presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 22, 2010 |
CategoryPi - Complaint For Personal Injury |
Last RefreshedJanuary 12, 2022 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationSolano County, CA |
Matter TypePersonal Injury |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 26, 2012 | Docket Event | VACATED | |
September 26, 2012 | Docket Event | ORDER | |
September 25, 2012 | Docket Event | DISMISSAL ENTIRE ACTION W/PRE | |
September 25, 2012 | Docket Event |
DISMISSAL ENTIRE ACTION W/PRE NGUYEN, XUAN MAI |
|
September 14, 2012 | Docket Event |
NOTC OF UNCONDITIONAL SETTLMNT NGUYEN, XUAN MAI |
|
June 13, 2012 | Docket Event | TRIAL SET | |
June 13, 2012 | Docket Event | HEARD | |
June 13, 2012 | Docket Event | MINUTE ORDER | |
June 01, 2012 | Docket Event |
CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT ONE LA CHARRITA MEXICAN MARKET, |
|
May 24, 2012 | Docket Event |
CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT ONE NGUYEN, XUAN MAI |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.