Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Bugler Construction, Bugler, Glenn, Hernandez, Jose, Hukill, Elvie, Hukill, Mark, (total of 7) See All filed a(n) General Criminal - Criminal case represented by Alfert, Peter W., Kahn, Karen, against California Department Of Transportation, A Public Entity, The State Of California, A Public Entity, represented by Anderson, John R., Knox, Jeffrey B., in the jurisdiction of Solano County. This case was filed in Solano County Superior Courts with Michael Mattice presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 22, 2010 |
CategoryCx - Provisionally Complex Civil |
Last RefreshedJanuary 12, 2022 |
Practice AreaCriminal |
Filing LocationSolano County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Criminal |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 18, 2021 | Docket Event | CHECK CREATED | |
March 22, 2017 | Docket Event | ACKNOWLEDGMENT | |
February 27, 2017 | Docket Event | EXHIBITS/ORDERS FOR RELEASE/DE | |
February 23, 2017 | Docket Event | SUBMITTED | |
February 17, 2017 | Docket Event |
SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT HUKILL, ELVIE |
|
February 17, 2017 | Docket Event |
SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT HUKILL, MARK |
|
February 17, 2017 | Docket Event |
SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT VILLASENOR, OSCAR |
|
February 17, 2017 | Docket Event |
SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT HERNANDEZ, JOSE |
|
February 17, 2017 | Docket Event |
SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT BUGLER, GLENN |
|
January 20, 2017 | Docket Event | PAYMENT |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.