Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Ryan, Joseph D, filed a(n) Mp - Miscellaneous Civil Petition case against Geico Indemnity Company, in the jurisdiction of Solano County. This case was filed in Solano County Superior Courts with Scott L. Kays presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 22, 2010 |
CategoryMp - Miscellaneous Civil Petition |
Last RefreshedJanuary 12, 2022 |
|
Filing LocationSolano County, CA |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 06, 2011 | Docket Event | ORDER | |
April 06, 2011 | Docket Event | CLOSED | |
April 05, 2011 | Docket Event |
ORDER RYAN, JOSEPH D |
|
March 29, 2011 | Docket Event | MINUTE ORDER | |
March 29, 2011 | Docket Event | HEARD | |
March 15, 2011 | Docket Event |
REPLY RYAN, JOSEPH D |
|
March 15, 2011 | Docket Event |
DECLARATION RYAN, JOSEPH D |
|
March 11, 2011 | Docket Event |
OPPOSITION (NO FEE) GEICO INDEMNITY COMPANY, |
|
March 08, 2011 | Docket Event |
PROOF OF SERVICE RYAN, JOSEPH D |
|
February 28, 2011 | Docket Event |
MOTION FEE RYAN, JOSEPH D |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.