Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Jpmorgan Chase Bank, Na., As Acquirer Of Certain Assets Of W, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Silverman, Timothy J., against Chung, Myungjoo, Chung, Tai Moon, represented by Bae, Johnathan, in the jurisdiction of Solano County. This case was filed in Solano County Superior Courts with GARRETT, RAMONA J. presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 15, 2010 |
CategoryCb - Breach Of Contract |
Last RefreshedFebruary 14, 2022 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationSolano County, CA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 26, 2012 | Docket Event |
DISMISSAL ENTIRE ACTION W/PRE JPMORGAN CHASE BANK, NA., as acquirer of certain assets of W, |
|
August 24, 2011 | Docket Event |
STIPULATION & ORDER (NO FEE) JPMORGAN CHASE BANK, NA., as acquirer of certain assets of W, |
|
August 18, 2011 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF CONDITIONAL SETTLMNT JPMORGAN CHASE BANK, NA., as acquirer of certain assets of W, |
|
August 18, 2011 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF CONDITIONAL SETTLMNT | |
August 05, 2011 | Docket Event |
CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT TWO JPMORGAN CHASE BANK, NA., as acquirer of certain assets of W, |
|
August 03, 2011 | Docket Event |
CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT TWO CHUNG, TAI MOON |
|
April 21, 2011 | Docket Event | MINUTE ORDER | |
April 20, 2011 | Docket Event | HEARD | |
April 07, 2011 | Docket Event |
CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT ONE CHUNG, TAI MOON |
|
April 06, 2011 | Docket Event |
CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT ONE JPMORGAN CHASE BANK, NA., as acquirer of certain assets of W, |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.