Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Marzan, Joseph, filed a(n) General Employment - Labor and Employment case against Costco Wholesale Corporation, in the jurisdiction of Solano County. This case was filed in Solano County Superior Courts with Scott L. Kays presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 20, 2007 |
CategoryE - Employment |
Last RefreshedJanuary 12, 2022 |
Practice AreaLabor and Employment |
Filing LocationSolano County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Employment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 04, 2008 | Docket Event | STOP ACTION | |
June 04, 2008 | Docket Event |
ORDER COSTCO WHOLESALE CORPORATION, |
|
June 04, 2008 | Docket Event | VACATED | |
June 04, 2008 | Docket Event | CLOSED | |
June 03, 2008 | Docket Event |
NOTICE (NO FEE) COSTCO WHOLESALE CORPORATION, |
|
May 29, 2008 | Docket Event |
CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT ONE MARZAN, JOSEPH |
|
May 29, 2008 | Docket Event | HEARD | |
May 29, 2008 | Docket Event | MINUTE ORDER | |
May 23, 2008 | Docket Event |
CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT ONE COSTCO WHOLESALE CORPORATION, |
|
May 21, 2008 | Docket Event |
NOTICE (NO FEE) MARZAN, JOSEPH |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.