Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Garcia, Maria, filed a(n) General Employment - Labor and Employment case against Commission On Medical Care, in the jurisdiction of Solano County. This case was filed in Solano County Superior Courts with Harry S. Kinnicutt presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 12, 2007 |
CategoryE - Employment |
Last RefreshedJanuary 12, 2022 |
Practice AreaLabor and Employment |
Filing LocationSolano County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Employment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 07, 2009 | Docket Event |
DISMISSAL ENTIRE ACTION W/PRE GARCIA, MARIA |
|
January 07, 2009 | Docket Event | DISMISSAL ENTIRE ACTION W/PRE | |
January 06, 2009 | Docket Event |
NOTC OF UNCONDITIONAL SETTLMNT GARCIA, MARIA |
|
January 02, 2009 | Docket Event | HEARD | |
January 02, 2009 | Docket Event | MINUTE ORDER | |
January 02, 2009 | Docket Event | VACATED | |
December 31, 2008 | Docket Event |
NOTC OF UNCONDITIONAL SETTLMNT GARCIA, MARIA |
|
December 08, 2008 | Docket Event | NOTICE (NO FEE) | |
December 08, 2008 | Docket Event | VACATED | |
September 17, 2008 | Docket Event | HEARD |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.