Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Sonoma, County Of, filed a(n) Child Support - Family case represented by Dept Of Child Support Services, in the jurisdiction of Stanislaus County. This case was filed in Stanislaus County Superior Courts with Kenneth J. Hara presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMarch 19, 2021 |
CategoryDept. Of Child Support Services (Dcss) |
Last RefreshedJune 23, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationStanislaus County, CA |
Matter TypeChild Support |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 22, 2021 | Docket Event |
Law & Motion Modification
Judge: Hara, Kenneth J |
|
June 16, 2021 | Docket Event | Proof of Service by Mail (Governmental) | |
May 06, 2021 | Docket Event | Proof of Service by Mail (Governmental) | |
May 06, 2021 | Docket Event | Proof of Personal Service | |
May 06, 2021 | Docket Event | Law and Motion Filed- Modification | |
March 30, 2021 | Docket Event | Proof of Service by Mail (Governmental) | |
March 25, 2021 | Docket Event | Notice Regarding Payment of Support | |
March 19, 2021 | Docket Event | California Registration of Foreign Order |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.