Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case in the jurisdiction of San Bernardino County. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts with David R. Proulx presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateOctober 28, 2009 |
CategoryDissolution W/ Minor Children |
Last RefreshedJanuary 29, 2023 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationSan Bernardino County, CA |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 24, 2012 | Hearing | Comment: Comment 3 CERT COPIES OF ORD AFT HRG SENT TO DCSS-VV | |
June 08, 2011 | Hearing | Comment: Comment 3X CERT COPIES OF 8/31/10 OAHG & 4/8/10 JGMT TO VV DCSS A MARKBY | |
June 07, 2011 | Hearing | Comment: Comment 3 CERT COPIES OF ALL COURT ORDER SENT TO DCSS VV S | |
October 26, 2010 | Hearing | Comment: Comment 3 C/C OAHG 8-31-10 SENT TO DCSS | |
September 13, 2010 | Hearing | Proof of Service Filed Comment PROOF OF SERVICE OF ORDER AFTER HEARING BY MAIL ON 09/10/10 AS TO ROBERT HOLT III, FILED. | |
September 13, 2010 | Hearing | Proof of Service Filed Comment PROOF OF SERVICE OF ORDER AFTER HEARING BY MAIL ON 09/10/10 AS TO BILLIE HOLT, FILED. | |
August 31, 2010 | Hearing | Stipulation for Appointment of Court Commissioner filed Comment STIP FOR APPOINTMENT OF COURT COMMISSIONER AS JUDGE PRO TEM FILED (IMAGED) | |
August 31, 2010 | Hearing | Attachment to Minute Order Comment ATTACHMENT TO 08/31/10 MINUTE ORDER | |
August 31, 2010 | Hearing | Legacy Minutes Comment MOTION RE: RE: MODIFY CHILD SUPPORT,HEALTH CARE, PRVSN,CONSOLIDAT(7-28-10) BY THE COUNTY OF SAN BERNARDINO FILED. (MODIFICATION GOVERNMENTAL) DAVID R PROULX PRESIDING CLERK: VICKY GAITAN COURT REPORTER LORI HARTON;9519 BAILIFF: P BUSH - APPEARANCES: ATTORNEY DAN BELL PRESENT FOR THE COUNTY OF SAN BERNARDINO CHILD SUPPORT DIVISION. PETITIONER BILLIE HOLT PRESENT PARTIES NOT PRESENT: ROBERT HOLT III - PROCEEDINGS: STIP FOR APPOINTMENT OF COURT COMMISSIONER AS JUDGE PRO TEM FILED OSC/MOTION HELD. ORAL REPORT GIVEN BY DAN BELL. WITNESS -- BILLIE HOLT IS SWORN AND EXAMINED. - COURT FINDS: ACTION CONSOLIDATED PHYSICALLY WITH VDAVS045996 -- CASE # FAMVS902961 DEEMED MASTER FILE. THE COURT ORDERS BILLIE HOLT, ROBERT HOLT III PROVIDE MEDICAL/DENTAL/VISION INSURANCE, IF AVAILABLE THROUGH HIS/HER EMPLOYMENT AT LOW OR NO COST. - SUPPORT ORDERS: THE COURT ORDERS ROBERT HOLT III TO PAY AS AND FOR CHILD SUPPORT FOR A TOTAL OF $$1,266.00 PER MONTH, PAYABLEON THE 1ST DAY OF EACH MONTH COMMENCING 090110 AND CONTINUING UNTIL FURTHER ORDER OF THE COURT. SUPPORT FINDINGS ARE SET FORTH ON THE COMPUTER PRINTOUT ATTACHED. CHILD SUPPORT SERVICES IS ORDERED TO ENFORCE BY WAGE ASSIGNMENT, PURSUANT TO FC5230 WITHOUT PREJUDICE TO OTHER MEANS OF COLLECTION AND ENFORCEMENT PURSUANT TO RTC19271(E)(3). SUPPORT PAYMENTS TO BE MADE THROUGH CHILD SUPPORT SERVICES UNTIL WAGE ASSIGNMENT IS IN EFFECT. ACTION - COMPLETE === MINUTE ORDER END === | |
August 31, 2010 | Hearing | Order After Hearing Filed Comment ORDER AFTER HEARING FILED. HEARING DATE 08/31/10 IN DEPT V11. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.