Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Kelley, Amanda K, Kelley, David, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Kelley, Amanda, in the jurisdiction of San Bernardino County. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts Superior with James Bruce Minton presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateOctober 05, 2009 |
CategoryDissolution W/ Minor Children |
Last RefreshedDecember 21, 2023 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationSan Bernardino County, CA |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 22, 2023 |
Department B3 - Barstow
Judge: Minton, James Bruce |
||
December 20, 2023 | Docket Event |
ExParte Request for Ordr Recd & Set for Hrg re: Mod CC or CV Change Child custody, Visitation (parenting time), and Other: Telephone time with minor children |
|
December 08, 2023 | Docket Event |
Document is Returned by Court for the Following Reason(s): The Findings and Order After Hearing, for the 03/22/2022 hearing, is being returned for the following: Duplicate filing. Filed on 10/24/2023. |
|
October 24, 2023 |
Department B3 - Barstow
Judge: Minton, James Bruce |
||
October 24, 2023 | Docket Event | Findings & Order After Hearing Filed | |
October 20, 2023 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service Notice of limited scope representation served electronically 10/20/2023 |
|
October 20, 2023 | Docket Event |
Notice of Limited Scope Representation Filed Filed by: Amanda Kelley re: James A. Alderson |
|
October 20, 2023 | Docket Event |
Document Received FS: Notice of limited scope representation, Proof of electronic service |
|
October 12, 2023 | Docket Event | Declaration Under UCCJEA filed | |
October 12, 2023 | Docket Event |
Responsive Declaration re: RFO filed filed on 6/15/23 by Amanda Kelley hearing is 10/24/23 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.