Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
filed a(n) Domestic Violence - Family case in the jurisdiction of San Bernardino County. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts with David R. Proulx presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJune 02, 2009 |
CategoryDv Prevention W/ Minor Children |
Last RefreshedJanuary 29, 2023 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationSan Bernardino County, CA |
Matter TypeDomestic Violence |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 28, 2011 | Hearing | Fee Payment Comment FEE PAYMENT 110428-2962-MC FCP/ 20.00 PAYMT | |
July 02, 2009 | Hearing | Legacy Minutes Comment HEARING ON DOMESTIC VIOLENCE FILED BY ANNETTE JOHNSON DAVID R PROULX PRESIDING CLERK: VICKY GAITAN COURT REPORTER WENDY LUCERO;11855 BAILIFF: P BUSH - APPEARANCES: PETITIONER ANNETTE JOHNSON PRESENT RESPONDENT BENJAMIN ROSSER JR PRESENT - PROCEEDINGS: STIP FOR APPOINTMENT OF COURT COMMISSIONER AS JUDGE PRO TEM FILED OSC/MOTION HELD. WITNESS -- ANNETTE JOHNSON IS SWORN AND EXAMINED. WITNESS -- BENJAMIN ROSSER JR IS SWORN AND EXAMINED. - COURT FINDS: THE COURT ORDERS THAT THE TEMPORARY RESTRAINING AND STAYAWAY ORDERS MADE ON 6/4/09 ARE MADE PERMANENT ORDERS OF THE COURT AND ARE TO BE IN EFFECT FOR 6 MONTHS FROM TODAYS DATE. THIS ORDER SHALL EXPIRE AT MIDNIGHT ON 01/08/10 COMPLAINT STAGE AT DISPOSITION -- JUDGMENT AFTER HEARING.(FL) DISPOSITION: JUDGMENT AFTER HEARING (FL) ACTION - COMPLETE === MINUTE ORDER END === | |
July 02, 2009 | Hearing | Restraining Order After Hearing Filed Comment RESTRAINING ORDER AFTER HEARING (CLETS) FILED. HEARING DATE: 07/02/09. ORDER EXPIRES: 01/07/10. | |
July 02, 2009 | Hearing | Stipulation for Appointment of Court Commissioner filed Comment STIP FOR APPOINTMENT OF COURT COMMISSIONER AS JUDGE PRO TEM FILED | |
July 02, 2009 | Hearing | Hearing on Domestic Violence Original Type Hearing on Domestic Violence Hearing Time 8:29 AM Result Held Comment HEARING ON DOMESTIC VIOLENCE FILED BY ANNETTE JOHNSON | |
June 24, 2009 | Hearing | Proof of Service Filed Comment PROOF OF SERVICE OF ANSWER TO TRO BY MAIL ON 06/24/09 AS TO ANNETTE JOHNSON, FILED. | |
June 24, 2009 | Hearing | Response to Temporary Restraining Order Filed Comment ANSWER TO TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER FILED BY BENJAMIN ROSSER JR, PARTY REPRESENTED BY PRO/PER. | |
June 05, 2009 | Hearing | Proof of Service Filed. Type of Service is: Comment PROOF OF SERVICE OF TRO & NTC OF HRNG; REQ FOR ORDER, BLANK ANSWER FILED AS TO BENJAMIN ROSSER JR. PARTY SERVED ON 06/05/09. TYPE OF SERVICE IS PERSONAL. | |
June 04, 2009 | Hearing | Legacy Minutes Judicial Officer Proulx, David R Comment EX-PARTE MOTION RE: TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER (060209) BY A JOHNSON DAVID R PROULX PRESIDING. CLERK: LINNEA RIVERA COURT REPORTER WENDY LUCERO;11855 BAILIFF: P BUSH - APPEARANCES: PETITIONER ANNETTE JOHNSON PRESENT RESPONDENT BENJAMIN ROSSER JR PRESENT - PROCEEDINGS: DECLARATION REGARDING EXPARTE NOTICE FILED. EX-PARTE HEARING IS HELD. EX PARTE APPLICATION ARGUED. EX PARTE ORDERS GRANTED EX PARTE ORDER SIGNED BY THE COURT. THE COURT MAKES A FACTUAL FINDING DETERMINATION. ACTION - COMPLETE === MINUTE ORDER END === | |
June 04, 2009 | Hearing | Temporary Restraining Order re: Domestic Violence Prevention Comment TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER AND NOTICE OF HEARING (DOMESTIC VIOLENCE PREVENTION)FILED BY ANNETTE JOHNSON |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.