Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case in the jurisdiction of San Bernardino County. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts with Cabrera, Carlos presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 20, 2021 |
CategoryDissolution W/O Minor Children |
Last RefreshedJanuary 28, 2023 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationSan Bernardino County, CA |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 30, 2021 | Hearing | Legacy Minutes Comment STATUS CONFERENCE | |
July 30, 2021 | Hearing | Status Conference View Document **FL - Portal Minute Order Judicial Officer Cabrera, Carlos Hearing Time 8:30 AM Result Not Held Comment STATUS CONFERENCE | |
July 28, 2021 | Hearing | Case Re-Assigned to Barstow for all Purposes. Notice sent. Comment to all parties with address on file | |
June 25, 2021 | Hearing | Document Received Comment JUDGMENT PACKET | |
June 21, 2021 | Hearing | Legacy Minutes Comment STATUS OF FILING JUDGMENT | |
May 24, 2021 | Hearing | Proof of Service Filed Comment Notice of Continuance | |
May 18, 2021 | Hearing | Decl re: Service of Decl of Disclosure and I & E Filed Comment Preliminary | |
May 13, 2021 | Hearing | Legacy Minutes Judicial Officer Cabrera, Carlos Comment REQUEST FOR ORDER FILED BY STACY LENIHAN RE: SS/ATTY FEES (032221) CARLOS CABRERA,JUDGE CLERK: GUADALUPE MORA COURT REPORTER WENDY LUCERO;11855 BAILIFF: C MORRIS - APPEARANCES: ATTORNEY KERRIE JUSTICE PRESENT FOR DEFENDANT/RESPONDENT. SPECIAL APPEARANCE BY ATTORNEY KERRIE JUSTICE FOR ATTORNEY CHRISTIAN SCHANK. PARTIES NOT PRESENT: RAYMOND LENIHAN, STACY LENIHAN - PROCEEDINGS: REQUEST FOR ORDER HELD. STACY LENIHAN'S REQUEST FOR ORDER RE:SS/ATTY FEES IS HEARD ORAL REPORT GIVEN BY KERRIE JUSTICE. COURT IS INFORMED THAT THE PARTIES HAVE REACHED A FULL AGREEMENT AND WILL BE SUBMITTING A STIPULATED JUDGEMENT. COUNSEL IS REQUESTING A STATUS CONFERENCE DATE. COURT WILL GRANT THE REQUEST. - HEARINGS: STATUS CONFERENCE HEARING SET FOR 07/30/21 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT B5. COUNSEL FOR RESPONDENT TO GIVE NOTICE. ACTION - COMPLETE === MINUTE ORDER END === | |
May 13, 2021 | Hearing | Request For Order Re: Original Type Request For Order Re: Judicial Officer Cabrera, Carlos Hearing Time 8:30 AM Result Held Comment REQUEST FOR ORDER FILED BY STACY LENIHAN RE: SS/ATTY FEES (032221) | |
April 07, 2021 | Hearing | Proof of Service Filed Comment PROOF OF SERVICE OF RFO BY MAIL ON 04/06/21 AS TO CHRISTIAN L SCHANK, FILED. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.