Case Last Refreshed: 2 months ago
Felix, Patricia, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Felix, Victor, in the jurisdiction of San Bernardino County. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts Superior with Bovee, Guy presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateOctober 13, 2015 |
CategoryDissolution No Children |
Last RefreshedApril 23, 2024 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationSan Bernardino County, CA |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 02, 2024 |
Department B4 - Barstow
Judge: Bovee, Guy |
||
April 23, 2024 |
Department B4 - Barstow
Judge: Bovee, Guy |
||
April 22, 2024 | Docket Event |
Document Received FS: Declaration Regarding Ex Parte Ntc to Opposing Party x2 |
|
April 19, 2024 | Docket Event |
ExParte Request for Order Received and Set for Hearing re: Oth: Directing AT&T Intellectual to release phone records for Victor Felix Reyes number endeing in 8930 |
|
April 19, 2024 | Docket Event |
Document Received FS: Tempt Ex Parte Orders, Dec Regarding Ex Parte Ntc to Opposing Party x2, RFO |
|
April 11, 2024 | Docket Event | Order on Request to Continue Hearing Filed - Granted | |
April 11, 2024 |
Department B4 - Barstow
Judge: Bovee, Guy |
||
April 09, 2024 | Docket Event | Response to Temporary Restraining Order Filed | |
April 09, 2024 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service by Mail (CLETS) Response to request for DV restraining ordr |
|
April 09, 2024 | Docket Event |
Document is Returned by Court for the Following Reason(s): Proof of Service and copy of a EA-110 on a different case received via FileSubmit on 4-8-24 are returned for the following reasons: -There are two separate attachments. The proof of service is incomplete-see #6. The other attachment is a document that has already been filed with the court for a different case. Unclear why this is being submitted as it is. Should this be attached to pleading or a declaration and used ais returned for the following reasons: |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.