Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case in the jurisdiction of San Bernardino County. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts with Lynne Glickstein presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMarch 01, 2011 |
CategoryDissolution W/ Minor Children |
Last RefreshedNovember 20, 2022 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationSan Bernardino County, CA |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 26, 2015 | Hearing | Legacy Minutes Comment MOTION RE: RE: MOD C/S/50% UNREIMB MEDICAL(12-05-14) BY THE COUNTY OF SAN BERNARDINO FILED. (MODIFICATION GOVERNMENTAL) JUDGE PRO TEM R LYNNE GLICKSTEIN CLERK: EILEEN CHRISTIANSEN NOT REPORTED BAILIFF: P BUSH - APPEARANCES: PETITIONER ESTHER MIRANDA PRESENT RESPONDENT LUIS IGNACIO MENDEZ PRESENT ATTORNEY SUZIE SATO PRESENT FOR THE COUNTY OF SAN BERNARDINO CHILD SUPPORT DIVISION. - PROCEEDINGS: OSC/MOTION HELD. STIPULATION AND ORDER SIGNED AND FILED. OFF-CALENDAR. REASON: STIPULATED AGREEMENT ORDER SIGNED THIS DATE. ACTION - COMPLETE === MINUTE ORDER END === | |
January 26, 2015 | Hearing | Stipulation & Order filed Comment STIPULATION AND ORDER RE: GUIDELINE SUPPORT FILED. | |
January 26, 2015 | Hearing | DCSS - OSC / MTN / RFO Modification Original Type DCSS - OSC / MTN / RFO Modification Hearing Time 8:30 AM Result Held Comment MOTION RE: RE: MOD C/S/50% UNREIMB MEDICAL(12-05-14) BY THE COUNTY OF SAN BERNARDINO FILED. (MODIFICATION GOVERNMENTAL) | |
January 12, 2015 | Hearing | Income and Expense Declaration Filed Comment INCOME AND EXPENSE DECLARATION FILED BY ESTHER MIRANDA (IMAGED) | |
December 05, 2014 | Hearing | Hearing Re: Comment MOTION RE: RE: MOD C/S/50% UNREIMB MEDICAL(12-05-14) BY THE COUNTY OF SAN BERNARDINO FILED. (MODIFICATION GOVERNMENTAL) | |
November 12, 2014 | Hearing | Proof of Service Filed Comment PROOF OF SERVICE OF NRPS BY MAIL ON 11/10/14 AS TO ESTHER MIRANDA, FILED. | |
November 12, 2014 | Hearing | Proof of Service Filed Comment PROOF OF SERVICE OF NRPS BY MAIL ON 11/10/14 AS TO LUIS I MENDEZ BARRANCO, FILED. | |
November 12, 2014 | Hearing | On Case Party is Added as: Comment ON THE DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE WITH CHILDREN OF ESTHER MIRANDA, THE COUNTY OF SAN BERNARDINO IS ADDED AS A THIRD PARTY. | |
November 12, 2014 | Hearing | Notice re: Payment of Support Filed (DCSS Added) Comment NOTICE RE: PAYMENT OF SUPPORT FILED (DCSS ADDED) | |
October 17, 2014 | Hearing | Comment: Comment COPY OF ORDR/JUDGMENT DATED 5-9-13 TO DCSS-LL PER REQUEST |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.