Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
filed a(n) Domestic Violence - Family case in the jurisdiction of San Bernardino County. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts with Cabrera, Carlos presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJuly 06, 2021 |
CategoryDv Prevention W/O Minor Children |
Last RefreshedNovember 20, 2022 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationSan Bernardino County, CA |
Matter TypeDomestic Violence |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 01, 2021 | Hearing | Restraining Order After Hearing Filed-Granted | |
September 01, 2021 | Hearing | This order shall expire at midnight on Comment 09/01/2026 | |
September 01, 2021 | Hearing | Hearing on Domestic Violence View Document **FL - Portal Minute Order Judicial Officer Cabrera, Carlos Hearing Time 8:30 AM Result Held Comment filed by Iris Rios (070621) | |
July 29, 2021 | Hearing | Order on Request to Continue Hearing Filed - Granted | |
July 29, 2021 | Hearing | Hearing on Domestic Violence View Document **FL - Portal Minute Order Judicial Officer Cabrera, Carlos Hearing Time 8:30 AM Result Continued Party's motion Comment IRIS RIOS-7/6/21 | |
July 26, 2021 | Hearing | Case Re-Assigned to Barstow for all Purposes. Notice sent. Comment to all parties with address on file | |
July 13, 2021 | Hearing | Proof of Service Filed. Type of Service is: Comment Temp Ordr,Request,Ntc of hrg,Blank Response | |
July 06, 2021 | Hearing | Temporary Restraining Order Filed - Granted | |
July 06, 2021 | Hearing | Notice of Hearing Filed (Domestic Violence Prevention) | |
July 06, 2021 | Hearing | Document(s) Placed in File Comment ROAH pending hearing |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.