Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case in the jurisdiction of San Bernardino County. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts with Michael J. Gassner presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 10, 2022 |
CategoryDissolution No Children |
Last RefreshedNovember 20, 2022 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationSan Bernardino County, CA |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 10, 2022 | Hearing | Status Conference Judicial Officer Gassner, Michael J Hearing Time 8:30 AM Comment response filed on 03/11/21 | |
October 04, 2021 | Hearing | Informational Check List Provided (FL100) | |
October 04, 2021 | Hearing | Family Law 12 Month Review | |
October 04, 2021 | Hearing | Family Law At-Issue Memorandum for Trial Setting Filed Comment response filed on 03/11/21 | |
September 10, 2021 | Hearing | Document is Returned by Court for the Following Reason(s): Comment At issue lists an address for Respondent that does not match the address on file. | |
September 10, 2021 | Hearing | Decl re: Service of Decl of Disclosure and I & E Filed Comment Preliminary | |
March 18, 2021 | Hearing | Filing Fee Waived for Comment FILING FEE WAIVED ON DEBORAH JEAN FANCOTE FOR FIRST APP FEES IN THE AMOUNT OF $435.00. | |
March 18, 2021 | Hearing | Request for Waiver of Court Fees and Costs filed is Granted Comment REQUEST FOR WAIVER OF COURT FEES AND COSTS FILED BY DEBORAH JEAN FANCOTE IS GRABT | |
March 18, 2021 | Hearing | Order on Court Fee Waiver Granted Filed Comment ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER GRANTED FILED. | |
March 11, 2021 | Hearing | Request for Waiver of Court Fees and Costs Filed Comment REQUEST FOR WAIVER OF COURT FEES & COSTS FILED BY DEBORAH JEAN FANCOTE. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.