Case Last Refreshed: 1 month ago
Selvaggio, Danielle, The County Of San Bernardino, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case represented by Department Child Support Services, against Quiroz Jr., Edmundo, in the jurisdiction of San Bernardino County. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts Superior with Michael J Gassner presiding.
Case Number |
Time To Management186 days |
|
Filing DateOctober 02, 2017 |
CategoryDissolution With Children |
|
Last RefreshedMay 14, 2024 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions231 days |
Filing LocationSan Bernardino County, CA |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
|
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Case Cycle Time231 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 16, 2024 |
Department S55 - Historic
Judge: Gassner, Michael J |
||
April 05, 2024 |
Department S55 - Historic
Judge: Gassner, Michael J |
||
March 19, 2024 | Docket Event |
Correspondence Coversheet Generated to Mail: Continuance of Court Trial |
|
March 19, 2024 |
Department S55 - Historic
Judge: Gassner, Michael J |
||
January 12, 2024 |
Department S55 - Historic
Judge: Gassner, Michael J |
||
November 06, 2023 |
Department S55 - Historic
Judge: Gassner, Michael J |
||
August 18, 2023 |
Department S55 - Historic
Judge: Gassner, Michael J |
||
June 16, 2023 |
Department S55 - Historic
Judge: Gassner, Michael J |
||
April 12, 2023 |
Department S55 - Historic
Judge: Gassner, Michael J |
||
April 11, 2023 | Docket Event | Substitution of Attorney Filed |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.