Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case in the jurisdiction of San Bernardino County. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts with Michael J. Torchia presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateAugust 30, 2012 |
CategoryDissolution W/O Minor Children |
Last RefreshedNovember 20, 2022 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationSan Bernardino County, CA |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 30, 2015 | Hearing | Legacy Minutes Comment STATUS: FAMILY LAW | |
November 13, 2012 | Hearing | Legacy Minutes Judicial Officer Torchia, Michael Comment HEARING RE: FEE WAIVER REQUEST. SET BY DEPT M J TORCHIA,COMMISSIONER CLERK: JESSICA FLORES COURT REPORTER SOPHIA WISE;12008 BAILIFF: L STEPHENS - APPEARANCES: PARTIES NOT PRESENT: MARIA G SANTIAGO, SAUL RAMIREZ - PROCEEDINGS: PREDISPOSITION HEARING HELD - OFF-CALENDAR. REASON: CASE WAS DISMISSED ON 9-21-12. ACTION - COMPLETE === MINUTE ORDER END === | |
November 13, 2012 | Hearing | Hearing Re: Fee Waiver Original Type Hearing Re: Fee Waiver Judicial Officer Torchia, Michael Hearing Time 08:30 AM Cancel Reason Off Calendar Comment HEARING RE: FEE WAIVER REQUEST. SET BY DEPT | |
September 21, 2012 | Hearing | Request for Dismissal Filed Comment REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL FILED- WITHOUT PREJUDICE. COMPLAINT STAGE AT DISPOSITION -- JUDGMENT BEFORE HEARING. (FL) DISPOSITION: JUDGMENT BEFORE HEARING. (FL) | |
September 17, 2012 | Hearing | Fee Payment Comment FEE PAYMENT 120917-3131-CS FFS/ 0.20 TSB/ 0.02 PAYMT | |
August 31, 2012 | Hearing | Request for Waiver of Fees and Costs is Denied Comment REQUEST FOR WAIVER OF FEES AND COSTS OF MARIA G SANTIAGO IS DEN. | |
August 31, 2012 | Hearing | Order on Court Fee Waiver Denied Filed Comment ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER DENIED FILED. | |
August 30, 2012 | Hearing | Request for Waiver of Court Fees and Costs Filed Comment REQUEST FOR WAIVER OF COURT FEES & COSTS FILED BY MARIA G SANTIAGO. | |
August 30, 2012 | Hearing | Family Law Summons Issued - Original Filed in Court File Comment FAMILY LAW SUMMONS ISSUED - ORIGINAL FILED IN COURT FILE. | |
August 30, 2012 | Hearing | Case Assigned for All Purposes Comment CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT S10 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.