Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Martinez, Robert E., filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Quintana, Denise M., in the jurisdiction of San Bernardino County. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts Superior with Arthur A Harrison presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJuly 28, 2021 |
CategoryDissolution W/ Minor Children |
Last RefreshedNovember 10, 2023 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationSan Bernardino County, CA |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 07, 2023 |
Department S43 - Historic
Judge: Keller, Natalie S |
||
November 01, 2023 | Docket Event |
Proof of Personal Service Filed Request for Order for Change in Custody and Visitation and Other; Order to Attend Orientation and Family Court Services Appointment. |
|
October 27, 2023 | Docket Event | Declaration Under UCCJEA filed | |
October 27, 2023 | Docket Event |
Declaration OF ROBERT MARTINEZ |
|
October 27, 2023 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service Filed RESPONSIVE DECL TO RFO/UCCJEA/DECLARATION |
|
October 27, 2023 | Docket Event |
Responsive Declaration re: RFO filed 08/01/23 BY DENISE QUINTANA |
|
October 11, 2023 | Docket Event |
Document is Returned by Court for the Following Reason(s): Proof of Personal Service FL-330: Form is Incomplete. See # 2. Name of Party served is Blank . Correct and Resubmit. |
|
August 07, 2023 | Docket Event | Referred to Family Court Services. | |
August 01, 2023 | Docket Event | Declaration Under UCCJEA filed | |
August 01, 2023 | Docket Event | Order on Court Fee Waiver Filed - Granted |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.