Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
filed a(n) Domestic Violence - Family case in the jurisdiction of San Bernardino County. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts with Suber, Shannon presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJuly 01, 2021 |
CategoryDv Prevention W/O Minor Children |
Last RefreshedNovember 20, 2022 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationSan Bernardino County, CA |
Matter TypeDomestic Violence |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 09, 2022 | Hearing | Hearing on Domestic Violence View Document **FL - Portal Minute Order Judicial Officer Suber, Shannon Hearing Time 8:30 AM Result Not Held Comment filed by Cathy Jean Tyson | |
August 23, 2021 | Hearing | Order on Request to Continue Hearing Filed - Granted | |
August 23, 2021 | Hearing | Stipulation for Appointment of Court Commissioner filed | |
August 23, 2021 | Hearing | Hearing on Domestic Violence View Document **FL - Portal Minute Order Judicial Officer Suber, Shannon Hearing Time 10:30 AM Result Held Comment filed by Cathy Tyson | |
July 26, 2021 | Hearing | Order on Request to Continue Hearing Filed - Granted | |
July 26, 2021 | Hearing | Correspondence Coversheet Generated to Mail: Comment notice of hearing | |
July 26, 2021 | Hearing | Hearing on Domestic Violence View Document **FL - Portal Minute Order Judicial Officer Suber, Shannon Hearing Time 10:30 AM Result Continued Court's motion Comment FILED BY CATHY JEAN TYSON | |
July 20, 2021 | Hearing | Proof of Service by Mail (CLETS) | |
July 20, 2021 | Hearing | Response to Temporary Restraining Order Filed | |
July 07, 2021 | Hearing | Proof of Service Filed. Type of Service is: Comment PERSONAL. REQ FOR DVRO/TRO/NTC OF HRG |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.