Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
filed a(n) Domestic Violence - Family case in the jurisdiction of San Bernardino County. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts with Suber, Shannon presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJuly 01, 2021 |
CategoryDv Prevention W/ Minor Children |
Last RefreshedNovember 20, 2022 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationSan Bernardino County, CA |
Matter TypeDomestic Violence |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 24, 2021 | Hearing | Hearing on Domestic Violence Judicial Officer Suber, Shannon Hearing Time 1:30 PM Comment filed by Joy Buckley | |
August 23, 2021 | Hearing | Interpreter Coordinator Notified of Interpreter Needed Comment Language: | |
August 23, 2021 | Hearing | Stipulation for Appointment of Court Commissioner filed | |
August 23, 2021 | Hearing | Certification of Unavailability (INT-120) filed | |
August 23, 2021 | Hearing | Provisionally Qualified Interpreter Comment The interpreter has been provisionally qualified by the Presiding Judge for the language to be interpreted. The Court finds that a certified or registered interpreter is not available. Good cause exists to appoint a non-certified or non-registered interpreter and all pertinent Judicial Council procedures and guidelines have been followed pursuant to GC68561. The interpreter is qualified to interpret and the interpreter oath has been administered. A Certificate of Unavailability of Certified or Registered Interpreter is on file for this date with the court administrator. | |
August 23, 2021 | Hearing | Hearing on Domestic Violence View Document **FL - Portal Minute Order View Document Corrected Portal Minute Order Judicial Officer Suber, Shannon Hearing Time 10:30 AM Result Held Comment filed by Joy Buckley | |
July 28, 2021 | Hearing | Correspondence Coversheet Generated to Mail: | |
July 26, 2021 | Hearing | Order on Request to Continue Hearing Filed - Granted | |
July 26, 2021 | Hearing | Hearing on Domestic Violence View Document **FL - Portal Minute Order Judicial Officer Suber, Shannon Hearing Time 10:30 AM Result Continued Court's motion Comment Joy Buckley | |
July 07, 2021 | Hearing | Proof of Service Filed. Type of Service is: Comment PERSONAL. REQ FOR DVRO/TRO/NTC OF HRG |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.