Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case in the jurisdiction of San Bernardino County. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts with John W. Burdick presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJune 29, 2018 |
CategoryDissolution W/ Minor Children |
Last RefreshedNovember 20, 2022 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationSan Bernardino County, CA |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Case Cycle Time140 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 06, 2021 | Hearing | Legacy Minutes Comment STATUS: FAMILY LAW | |
July 31, 2019 | Hearing | Ex Parte App and Order for Restoration of Former Name Filed Comment EX PARTE APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR RESTORATION OF FORMER NAME AFTER ENTRY OF JUDGMENT FILED BY KRISTIN NOICE | |
June 27, 2019 | Hearing | Fee Payment Comment FEE PAYMENT 190627-0536-CS FCP/ 5.00 PAYMT | |
November 16, 2018 | Hearing | Legacy Minutes Judicial Officer Burdick, John W Comment HEARING RE: OSC RE: SANCTIONS AS TO PETITIONER JOHN W BURDICK,COMMISSIONER CLERK: KIMBERLEY HANNA COURT REPORTER JENNIFER BOROS;13355 BAILIFF: S ANDREWS - PETITIONER JEFFREY NOICE PRESENT PARTIES NOT PRESENT: KRISTIN NOICE - PROCEEDINGS: ACTION CAME ON FOR ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: SANCTIONS. OSC/MOTION HELD. STIP FOR APPOINTMENT OF COURT COMMISSIONER AS JUDGE PRO TEM FILED (SIGNED BY PETITIONER) JEFFREY NOICE IS SWORN AND TESTIFIES AS WITNESS FOR PETITIONER. COURT VACATES THE SANCTIONS AS TO PETITIONER ACTION CAME ON FOR DEFAULT HEARING. KRISTIN NOICE HAVING FAILED TO APPEAR, MATTER PROCEEDS AS A DEFAULT. THERE ARE NO COMMUNITY DEBTS SUBJECT TO DISPOSITION BY THE COURT. THERE IS NO COMMUNITY PROPERTY SUBJECT TO DISPOSITION BY THE COURT. SPOUSAL SUPPORT IS KNOWINGLY AND INTELLIGENTLY WAIVED BY JEFFREY NOICE. COURT TERMINATES JURISDICTION OVER SPOUSAL SUPPORT AS TO BOTH PARTIES. PURSUANT TO FAMILY CODE SECTION 3048, THE COURT HAS JURISDICTION TO MAKE ORDERS REGARDING CUSTODY UNDER THE FAMILY CODE AND THE UNIFORM CHILD CUSTODY JURISDICTION AND ENFORCEMENT ACT. NOTICE AND OPPORTUNITY TO BE HEARD WAS GIVEN TO THE PARTIES/RESPONDING PARTY AS PROVIDED BY THE LAWS OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA. THE COUNTRY OF HABITUAL RESIDENCE OF THE CHILD/CHILDREN IS THE UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. MINOR CHILD DOB: 01/07/14 JOINT LEGAL AND PHYSICAL CUSTODY OF THE MINOR CHILD/CHILDREN SHALL BE AWARDED TO BOTH PARTIES. THE COURT RESERVES JURISDICTION ON THE FOLLOWING ISSUES: CHILD SUPPORT. THE COURT FINDS THAT THE STATUTORY AND JURISDICTIONAL RESIDENT REQUIREMENTS ARE MET. THE COURT FINDS JURISDICTION WAS ACQUIRED BY KRISTIN NOICE ON 06/29/18 BY FILING OF SERVICE OF PROCESS. DECREE OF DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE GRANTED ON GROUNDS OF IRRECONCILABLE DIFFERENCES. MARITAL STATUS TERMINATE 12/30/18, OR UPON SIGNING OF JUDGMENT, WHICHEVER LATER OCCURS. ACTION DISPO: JUDGMENT JUDGMENT SIGNED. COMPLAINT STAGE AT DISPOSITION -- JUDGMENT AFTER HEARING.(FL) DISPOSITION: JUDGMENT AFTER HEARING (FL) ACTION - COMPLETE === MINUTE ORDER END === | |
November 16, 2018 | Hearing | Notice of Entry of Judg. filed - Marital status terminates Comment NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - DATE MARITAL STATUS TERMINATES 12/30/18 | |
November 16, 2018 | Hearing | Family Law Judgment Filed Comment FAMILY LAW JUDGMENT ON DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE WITH CHILDREN OF JEFFREY NOICE FILED FAMILY LAW JUDGMENT ON DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE WITH CHILDREN OF JEFFREY NOICE ORDERED ENTERED 11/16/18 | |
November 16, 2018 | Hearing | Stipulation for Appointment of Court Commissioner filed Comment STIP FOR APPOINTMENT OF COURT COMMISSIONER AS JUDGE PRO TEM FILED | |
November 16, 2018 | Hearing | Hearing Re: Original Type Hearing Re: Judicial Officer Burdick, John W Hearing Time 09:00 AM Result Held Comment HEARING RE: OSC RE: SANCTIONS AS TO PETITIONER | |
October 05, 2018 | Hearing | Legacy Minutes Judicial Officer Burdick, John W Comment DEFAULT HEARING JOHN W BURDICK,COMMISSIONER CLERK: KIMBERLEY HANNA COURT REPORTER JENNIFER BOROS;13355 BAILIFF: S ANDREWS - PARTIES NOT PRESENT: JEFFREY NOICE, KRISTIN NOICE - PROCEEDINGS: ACTION CAME ON FOR DEFAULT HEARING. OSC/MOTION HELD. COURT SETS AN ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: SANCTIONS IN THE AMOUNT OF $250 AS TO PETITIONER FOR FAILING TO APPEAR FOR TODAY'S HEARING . ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: SANCTIONS IS SET FOR 11-16-18 AT 9:00 AM IN DEPARTMENT M4. - HEARINGS: HEARING RE:OSC RE: SANCTIONS AS TO PETITIONER SET FOR 11/16/18 AT 09:00 IN DEPARTMENT M4. NOTICE GIVEN BY JUDICIAL ASSISTANT CORRESPONDENCE COVERSHEET GENERATED TO MAIL COPY OF MINUTE ORDER DATED 10-05-18 TO COUNSEL OF RECORD. ACTION - COMPLETE === MINUTE ORDER END === | |
October 05, 2018 | Hearing | Notice Imaged Comment NOTICE IMAGED |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.