Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
filed a(n) Child Support - Family case in the jurisdiction of Merced County. This case was filed in Merced County Superior Courts with Seymour, Shelly presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeSeymour, Shelly Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateSeptember 19, 2001 |
CategoryRegister California Support Order-Dcss |
Last RefreshedFebruary 24, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationMerced County, CA |
Matter TypeChild Support |
Review: Contempt
Date: July 18, 2017Review: Contempt
Date: November 07, 2017Order Show Cause: Contempt
Date: May 23, 2017Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 28, 2017 | Docket Event | Proof of Service by Mail | |
November 16, 2017 | Docket Event |
Order After Hearing
Judge: Seymour, Shelly |
|
November 07, 2017 | Docket Event |
Non-Criminal: Minute Order Review: Contempt Judge: Seymour, Shelly |
|
July 28, 2017 | Docket Event | Proof of Service by Mail | |
July 24, 2017 | Docket Event |
Order After Hearing
Judge: McCabe, Brian |
|
July 18, 2017 | Docket Event |
Non-Criminal: Minute Order Review: Contempt Judge: McCabe, Brian |
|
May 30, 2017 | Docket Event | Proof of Service by Mail | |
May 26, 2017 | Docket Event |
Order After Hearing
Judge: Shaver, Donald |
|
May 23, 2017 | Docket Event |
Non-Criminal: Minute Order Order Show Cause: Contempt Judge: Shaver, Donald |
|
April 13, 2017 | Docket Event | Proof of Service by Mail |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.