Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
filed a(n) Child Support - Family case in the jurisdiction of Merced County. This case was filed in Merced County Superior Courts with Donald E. Shaver presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeDonald E. Shaver Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateMay 20, 2009 |
CategoryDcss Family Support |
|
Last RefreshedFebruary 24, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions275 days |
Filing LocationMerced County, CA |
Matter TypeChild Support |
|
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Case Cycle Time275 days |
Review: Seek Work
Date: August 24, 2020Review: Seek Work
Date: January 06, 2020Review: Contempt
Date: November 05, 2019Review: Contempt
Date: August 08, 2019Warrant Return
Date: July 30, 2019Motion
Date: July 11, 2019Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 01, 2020 | Docket Event | Proof of Service by Mail | |
August 26, 2020 | Docket Event |
Short Form Order After Hearing
Judge: Shaver, Donald |
|
August 24, 2020 | Docket Event |
Non-Criminal: Minute Order Review: Seek Work Judge: Shaver, Donald |
|
January 10, 2020 | Docket Event | Proof of Service by Mail | |
January 08, 2020 | Docket Event |
Short Form Order After Hearing
Judge: Shaver, Donald |
|
January 06, 2020 | Docket Event |
Non-Criminal: Minute Order Review: Seek Work Judge: Shaver, Donald |
|
November 21, 2019 | Docket Event | Proof of Service by Mail | |
November 19, 2019 | Docket Event |
Short Form Order After Hearing
Judge: Shaver, Donald |
|
November 05, 2019 | Docket Event |
Non-Criminal: Minute Order Review: Contempt Judge: Shaver, Donald |
|
August 27, 2019 | Docket Event | Proof of Service by Mail |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.