Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case in the jurisdiction of Merced County. This case was filed in Merced County Superior Courts with Shaver, Donald presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeShaver, Donald Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJune 08, 2009 |
CategoryDissolution With Minor Child |
Last RefreshedJune 30, 2023 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationMerced County, CA |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Case Cycle Time2842 days |
Child Custody Recommending Counseling
Date: April 26, 2018Order Show Cause: Seek Work
Date: May 11, 2018Further Proceedings
Date: May 17, 2018CCRC Child Interview
Date: April 04, 2018Child Custody Recommending Counseling
Date: April 05, 2018Further Proceedings
Date: April 19, 2018Request Dismissal
Date: April 20, 2015Warrant Return
Date: January 09, 2018Notice of Entry of Dismissal & POS
Date: April 23, 2015Review: Contempt
Date: March 20, 2018Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 14, 2018 | Docket Event | Substitution of Attorney | |
June 01, 2018 | Docket Event | Proof of Service by Mail | |
May 29, 2018 | Docket Event | Proof of Service by Mail | |
May 25, 2018 | Docket Event |
Order After Hearing
Judge: Seymour, Shelly |
|
May 25, 2018 | Docket Event |
Restraining Order After Hearing
Judge: Shaver, Donald |
|
May 23, 2018 | Docket Event | Notice: Change of Address/Firm Name | |
May 17, 2018 | Docket Event |
Non-Criminal: Minute Order Further Proceedings Judge: Seymour, Shelly |
|
May 17, 2018 | Docket Event |
Restraining Order Contested
Judge: Seymour, Shelly |
|
May 16, 2018 | Docket Event |
Order on Request to Continue Hearing
Judge: Seymour, Shelly |
|
May 15, 2018 | Docket Event | Request to Continue Hearing |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.