Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
filed a(n) Child Support - Family case in the jurisdiction of Merced County. This case was filed in Merced County Superior Courts with Seymour, Shelly presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeSeymour, Shelly Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateJune 22, 2010 |
CategoryDcss Family Support |
|
Last RefreshedFebruary 24, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions1460 days |
Filing LocationMerced County, CA |
Matter TypeChild Support |
|
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Case Cycle Time1460 days |
Review: Contempt
Date: August 15, 2017Order Show Cause: Contempt
Date: June 20, 2017Order Show Cause: Contempt
Date: October 31, 2017Order Show Cause: Contempt
Date: October 20, 2017Review: Contempt
Date: June 05, 2018Order Show Cause: Contempt
Date: September 19, 2017Review: Contempt
Date: February 20, 2018Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 25, 2019 | Docket Event | Public Historical Documents | |
June 20, 2018 | Docket Event | Proof of Service by Mail | |
June 18, 2018 | Docket Event |
Order After Hearing
Judge: Seymour, Shelly |
|
June 05, 2018 | Docket Event |
Non-Criminal: Minute Order Review: Contempt Judge: Seymour, Shelly |
|
June 05, 2018 | Docket Event | Order on Court Fee Waiver Granted - Full | |
June 05, 2018 | Docket Event | Income and Expense Declaration | |
June 05, 2018 | Docket Event | Request Fee Waiver for Court Fees - Original | |
March 01, 2018 | Docket Event | Proof of Service by Mail | |
February 23, 2018 | Docket Event | Order After Hearing | |
February 20, 2018 | Docket Event |
Non-Criminal: Minute Order Review: Contempt Judge: Seymour, Shelly |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.