Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
filed a(n) Child Support - Family case in the jurisdiction of Merced County. This case was filed in Merced County Superior Courts with Seymour, Shelly presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeSeymour, Shelly Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateJuly 26, 2006 |
CategoryDcss Family Support |
|
Last RefreshedFebruary 24, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions1423 days |
Filing LocationMerced County, CA |
Matter TypeChild Support |
|
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Case Cycle Time1423 days |
Request for Order: Modification
Date: June 21, 2017Child Custody Recommending Counseling
Date: August 09, 2017Motion
Date: April 03, 2018Review: Contempt
Date: August 18, 2017Child Custody Recommending Counseling
Date: July 06, 2018Request for Order: Modification
Date: July 20, 2018Notice: Entry of Judgment
Date: April 19, 2018Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 20, 2018 | Docket Event |
Non-Criminal: Minute Order Request for Order: Modification Judge: Seymour, Shelly |
|
July 06, 2018 | Docket Event |
Non-Criminal: Minute Order Child Custody Recommending Counseling Judge: Wakefield, Catherine |
|
June 11, 2018 | Docket Event | Proof of Service | |
June 11, 2018 | Docket Event | Proof of Service by Mail | |
May 24, 2018 | Docket Event | Proof of Service by Mail | |
May 16, 2018 | Docket Event | Order Granting Fee Waiver - Subsequent | |
May 16, 2018 | Docket Event | Declaration Under UCCJEA | |
May 16, 2018 | Docket Event | Income and Expense Declaration | |
May 16, 2018 | Docket Event | Request Fee Waiver - Subsequent | |
May 16, 2018 | Docket Event | Request for Order:Modification |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.